Dogfen lywodraethu BUSY BEES PLAY GROUP
Rhif yr elusen: 1031641
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/10/1993 AS AMENDED ON 22/10/1999 AS AMENDED ON 13/11/2003 AS AMENDED ON 12/07/2010 AS AMENDED ON 09/06/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE IN WYMONDHAM BY A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP CHILDREN
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.