Dogfen lywodraethu SOCIETY OF BOOKBINDERS
Rhif yr elusen: 1032108

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MARCH 1990, AS AMENDED ON 29 MAY, 27 NOVEMBER 1993, 22 JUNE 1996, 3 JULY 1999, 20 MAY 2000, 8 MARCH 2005 AND 22 AUGUST 2009. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25 AUG 2011 as amended on 20 Aug 2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF BOOKBINDING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE COLLECTION, COLLATION, EVALUATION AND ORGANISED DISSEMINATION OF CRAFT AND TECHNICAL INFORMATION .
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.