Dogfen lywodraethu BLACK COUNTRY WOMEN'S AID

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 FEBRUARY 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 JANUARY 1994 AND 18 JANUARY 1999 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16 SEP 2016 as amended on 15 Nov 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Charity’s objects, for the public benefit, are to relieve the physical and mental distress of (primarily) women, children and young people and in particular (but not limited to) those who are homeless, are experiencing, have experienced or are affected by violence, abuse or exploitation and/or are in or have been part of the criminal justice system.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE THE WEST MIDLANDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.