Dogfen lywodraethu COMPTON VERNEY HOUSE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 AUGUST 1993 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 29 DECEMBER 1993 AND 1 AUGUST 2000 AND ON 16 SEPTEMBER 2014 AS AMENDED ON 12 AUG 1995 AS AMENDED ON 10 FEB 2020 AS AMENDED ON 10 FEB 2020 as amended on 09 Jun 2021 as amended on 15 Feb 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES BUT IN PARTICULAR TO ESTABLISH A MUSEUM GALLERY AND EDUCATION CENTRE AT COMPTON VERNEY HOUSE AND/OR ANY OTHER PLACE OR PLACES AND TO RAISE AND EDUCATE THE ARTISTIC TASTE OF THE PUBLIC WHETHER IN RELATION TO PAINTING SCULPTURE THE APPLIED AND OTHER VISUAL ARTS AND IN RELATION TO MUSIC DRAMA DANCE AND OPERA AND THE FINE ARTS GENERALLY
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.