Dogfen lywodraethu Vale Domestic Abuse Services
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH FEBRUARY 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 14 FEBRUARY 1994 AND 1 SEPTEMBER 2009. as amended on 19 Nov 2018 as amended on 19 Nov 2018 as amended on 07 Jan 2021 as amended on 23 Feb 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The relief of all those in need, with particular reference to women and children, affected by any form of violence against women, domestic abuse, and sexual violence, through the provision of: a) Crisis services, including but not exclusively, refuge and advocacy; b) Mitigation services, including but not exclusively, counselling; c) Preventative services, including but not exclusively, education programmes; d) Awareness raising on the causes, consequences, and gendered nature of violence against women, domestic abuse, and sexual violence.?
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.