Dogfen lywodraethu DRAKE MUSIC
Rhif yr elusen: 1034374

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 03 NOVEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 3 JUNE 1994, 20 JANUARY 2005, 28 JULY 2008, 10 NOVEMBER 2008 AND 18 MARCH 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF DISABLED PEOPLE OF ALL AGES IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF MUSIC
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.