Dogfen lywodraethu CHORLEY AND SOUTH RIBBLE SHOPMOBILITY
Rhif yr elusen: 1035095

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 AUGUST 1993, AS AMENDED 8 DECEMBER 1993 AND 18 JUNE 1997, 24 JUNE 1998 AND 23 JUNE 1999
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE DISABLED PERSONS IN CHORLEY AND DISTRICT BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN PARTICULAR SELF PROPELLED WHEELCHAIRS AND SIMILAR EQUIPMENT IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR MOBILITY AND CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
CHORLEY AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.