Dogfen lywodraethu TINY TOTS NURSERY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/03/1984 AS AMENDED ON 24/06/2002 AS AMENDED ON 17/07/2002 AS AMENDED ON 07/10/2008 AS AMENDED ON 14/08/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS AND CARERS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN AND BY; A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, TOGETHER WITH RAISING THE AWARENESS OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND BECOME INVOLVED IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR CHILDREN, ENSURING THAT SUITABLE OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.