Dogfen lywodraethu THE ROYAL NATIONAL ROSE SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/01/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/03/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/06/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/07/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: TO ENCOURAGE, IMPROVE, AND EXTEND THE SCIENCE, ART AND PRACTICE OF THE CULTIVATION AND CONSERVATION OF ROSES AND TO DISSEMINATE KNOWLEDGE OF ROSES, ASSOCIATED OR COMPANION PLANTING AND ROSE GROWING BOTH IN THE GARDEN AND IN THE ENVIRONMENT BY MEANS OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, TRIALS, PUBLICATIONS, PROMOTION OF DISPLAY GARDENS, THE HOLDING AND REGULATION OF SHOWS, SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH, INTERNATIONAL CO-OPERATION AND OTHER APPROPRIATE ACTIVITIES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.