Dogfen lywodraethu HARNHAM DAY CENTRE

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JANUARY 1994 AS AMENDED AUGUST 1999 AS AMENDED ON 13 MAY 2013 as amended on 27 Jan 2022 as amended on 28 Apr 2022 as amended on 05 Sep 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREINAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF DAY CARE FACILITIES FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF HARNHAM WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE AND/OR INFIRMITY
Maes buddion
IN PRACTICE THE AREA OF HARNHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.