Dogfen lywodraethu CHICHESTER U3A

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY REVISED CONSTITUTION DATED 28/4/97 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 16 May 2019 as amended on 20 May 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Maes buddion
IN PRACTICE CHICHESTER AND SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.