Dogfen lywodraethu THE VALENTINE SINGERS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/03/1994 AS AMENDED ON 03/02/2006 AS AMENDED ON 10/02/2012 as amended on 21 Apr 2023 as amended on 12 Apr 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE DEVELOP IMPROVE AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY REHEARSING AS AN EVENING CLASS SPONSORED BY THE LONDON BOROUGH OF REDBRIDGE OR OTHERWISE AS DETERMINED BY ITS EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE AND BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SICH OTHER WAYS AS THE SINGERS THROUGH ITS EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME. ALSO, FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSE OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Maes buddion
IN PRACTICE THE LONDON BOROUGH OF REDBRIDGE AND DISTRICT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.