Dogfen lywodraethu EDUCATION AND SERVICES FOR PEOPLE WITH AUTISM LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 MAR 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 AUG 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 JUL 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 AUG 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 MAY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 DEC 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 AUG 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF PEOPLE WITH AUTISM, LEARNING DISABILITIES, COMMUNICATION, SOCIAL AND BEHAVIOURAL CONDITIONS BY ENHANCING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR BY: · PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR SUCH PEOPLE AND ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF OTHERS IN AUTISM, LEARNING DISABILITIES AND ASSOCIATED COMMUNICATION, SOCIAL OR BEHAVIOURAL CONDITIONS; · PROVIDING ACCOMMODATION AND SERVICES TO MEET THE NEEDS OF THESE INDIVIDUALS; · THE CARRYING OUT OR COMMISSIONING OF RESEARCH INTO IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR AUTISTIC PEOPLE AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.