Dogfen lywodraethu THE FRIENDS OF SOUTHWELL CATHEDRAL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JUNE 1977 AS AMENDED 4 JUNE 1994, 15 JUNE 1996, 13 JUNE 1998 AND 9 JUNE 2001. as amended on 07 Nov 2022 as amended on 15 Nov 2022 as amended on 17 Nov 2022 as amended on 08 Jun 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE RESTORATION, MAINTENANCE, REPAIR AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC, ORNAMENTS, VESTMENTS, FITTINGS, FURNITURE AND FURNISHINGS OF SOUTHWELL CATHEDRAL, AND TO MAINTAIN PUBLIC WORSHIP AND MUSIC THEREIN; AND TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES RELATING TO SOUTHWELL CATHEDRAL AS THE COUNCIL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Maes buddion
SOUTHWELL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.