Dogfen lywodraethu THE PORTSMOUTH COUNSELLING SERVICE
Rhif yr elusen: 1040457
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 OCTOBER 1993 AS AMENDED 26 JULY 1994, 27 FEBRUARY 1997, 22 MARCH 2000 & 27 NOVEMBER 2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS CAUSED BY MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILL HEALTH OR BY SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING AND DEVELOPING A VOLUNTARY CONFIDENTIAL COUNSELLING SERVICE
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
PORTSMOUTH AREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.