Dogfen lywodraethu The Dentons UK and Middle East LLP Charitable Trust
Rhif yr elusen: 1041204

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/09/1994 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27/04/2000 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10/04/2013 as amended on 29 Jan 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND/OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.