Dogfen lywodraethu CHIN-UP
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 SEPTEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 1 DECEMBER 1995, 18 JULY 1998 AND 12 MARCH 1999 AND 12TH FEBRUARY 2005 as amended on 01 Oct 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
Within the North East and Cumbria to relieve children and young people up to the age of 18, suffering with a terminal or progressive life limiting illness and their families by the provision of a free one week holiday break. These services are to be made available by the provision of a fully equipped independent holiday house.
Maes buddion
NORTH EAST AND CUMBRIA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.