Dogfen lywodraethu THE RETA LILA HOWARD FOUNDATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH OCTOBER 1994, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS MADE THE 6TH OCTOBER 1995, 18 APRIL 1996 AND 12 NOVEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED ON 25 APR 2023 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 JAN 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE COMPANY IS TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND AND THE REPUBLIC OF IRELAND AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.