SOWERBY NURSERY SCHOOL
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Sowerby Nursery School provides high quality nursery school care and education on a not-for-profit basis. Our aim is to provide a safe, stimulating, caring environment in which children can develop intellectually, socially, emotionally and physically.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 July 2021
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Gogledd Swydd Gaerefrog
Llywodraethu
- SOWERBY PLAYGROUP (Enw blaenorol)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £79.89k | £90.69k | £105.99k | £74.82k | £72.89k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £81.14k | £69.77k | £77.81k | £82.84k | £85.04k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £66.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | £5.38k | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2021 | 15 Rhagfyr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2021 | 15 Rhagfyr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2020 | 27 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2020 | 27 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2019 | 27 Mawrth 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2019 | 27 Mawrth 2020 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2018 | 21 Mai 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2018 | 21 Mai 2019 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Scheme dated 22 May 2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The aims of the Pre-school are to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by: (a) offering appropriate play, education and care facilities, family learning and extended hours groups, together with the right of parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of such groups, ensuring that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability; (b) encouraging the study of the needs of such children and their families and promoting public interest in and recognition of such needs in the local areas; (c) Instigating and adhering to and furthering the aims and objects of the Pre-school Learning Alliance.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window