Dogfen lywodraethu Caring for Communities and People
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 19 DECEMBER 1994, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 27 JANUARY 1996 , 23 JANUARY 1998 AND 4 JANUARY 2007. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06 JUL 2017 as amended on 04 Oct 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE FOR PEOPLE IN NEED PARTICULARLY THOSE AGED FROM 16 TO 25 YEARS WHO HAVE PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITIES; TO PROVIDE ACCOMMODATION FOR HOMELESS PERSONS; TO PROVIDE FOR THOSE ON FINANCIAL NEED, TO PROVIDE CARE AND SUPPORT AND RESETTLEMENT ADVICE TO THOSE IN NEED OR AT RISK
Maes buddion
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.