Dogfen lywodraethu THE RUTLISH FOUNDATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS OF 22 AUGUST 1994 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10 MAR 2020 AS AMENDED ON 11 DEC 2020 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15 OCT 2022 AS AMENDED ON 21 NOV 2022 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09 JAN 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; FIRST OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS AND THEREAFTER OF PERSONS OVER THAT AGE WHO WERE BORN OR ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF MERTON, OR WHO HAVE AT ANY TIME ATTENDED FOR A PERIOD OF AT LEAST ONE ACADEMIC YEAR AS A STUDENT AT RUTLISH SCHOOL OR ANY COMBINED 6TH FORM WHICH THE SCHOOL PARTICIPATES IN, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: (A) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION; AND (B) PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT; AND (2) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT RUTLISH SCHOOL BY PROVIDING FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT AND OTHER SUPPORT FOR EDUCATION ADDITIONAL TO THAT PROVIDED BY THE GOVERNORS OF THE SCHOOL. WITHIN THE LIMITS PRESCRIBED BY THIS SCHEME THE TRUSTEE SHALL HAVE FULL POWER TO MAKE RULES FROM TIME TO TIME FOR THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES AND OTHER BENEFITS UNDER THIS CLAUSE, AND ANY RULES AS TO THE AWARD OF PRIZES, AWARDS, AND OTHER SUCH REWARDS OR MARKS OF DISTINCTION UNDER CLAUSE 12 OF THIS SCHEME. IN THE CASE OF THIS CLAUSE AND ALSO OF CLAUSE 12 THE TRUSTEE MAY MAKE RULES AS TO THEIR VALUE, THE METHODS OF ASCERTAINMENT AND SELECTION OF CANDIDATES, AND WHERE APPROPRIATE, THE PERIOD OF TENURE.”
Maes buddion
MERTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.