Dogfen lywodraethu THE SOCIETY OF ST JAMES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/01/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/11/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/10/2013 as amended on 17 Oct 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF PERSONS WHO ARE HOMELESS, UNEMPLOYED OR WHO HAVE DRUG, ALCOHOL OR OTHER SUBSTANCE ADDICTIONS BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSING, REHABILITATION, CARE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES; IN ORDER TO IMPROVE INDIVIDUALS' OPPORTUNITIES AND QUALITY OF LIFE AND TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.