Dogfen lywodraethu THE MILLER CENTRE THEATRE COMPANY
Rhif yr elusen: 1044236

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (133 diwrnod yn hwyr)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1991 AS AMENDED 4 OCTOBER 1994, 14 OCTOBER 1997 AND 10 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 JUN 2024 as amended on 18 Jun 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC ARTS AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC TASTE THEREIN PARTICULARLY BY PRESENTING PLAYS AT THE MILLER CENTRE CATERHAM SURREY
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE LIMITED TO SURREY LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON AND ENVIRONS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.