Dogfen lywodraethu BETHPHAGE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 26 SEPTEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS ON 10 NOVEMBER 1994, 1 APRIL 1995 AND 25 SEPTEMBER 2009 CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 1 NOVEMBER 1996 AND 9 OCTOBER 2009 as amended on 06 Jul 2019 as amended on 10 Oct 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
5 The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically restricted to for the public benefit: (1) the relief of persons with disability (whether mental or physical) and/or mental health needs in particular by: (a) providing or assisting in the provision of residential accommodation and associated services, work schemes, training, education, facilities, employment opportunities, transport, equipment, creative arts, advocacy, care and support services for such persons; and (b) the provision of counselling, advice and support to persons with disability (whether mental or physical) and/or mental health needs, their families, carers, support groups and advocates; (2) advancing education by: (a) the provision of training to persons providing care for disabled people (whether their disability is mental or physical) and/or people with mental health needs; and (b) the provision of learning resources to further the development of individual capabilities, competences, skills and understanding.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.