Dogfen lywodraethu CANINE EPILEPSY SUPPORT GROUP
Rhif yr elusen: 1046436

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 MARCH 1995 AS AMENDED ON THE 10 NOVEMBER 1996 & 26 MAY 2002 AND 16 MAY 2004, AS AMENDED ON 17TH APRIL 2005
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1.TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING FOR PERSONS IN DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR OWNERSHIP OF ANIMALS SUFFERING FROM EPILEPSY. 2.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN UNDERSTANDING THE FORMS OF MANAGEMENT AND TREATMENT OF EPILEPSY IN ANIMALS. 3. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONGST ANIMALS SUFFERING FROM EPILEPSY.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.