Dogfen lywodraethu CALLIGRAPHY AND LETTERING ARTS SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 1046526

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MARCH 1995 AS AMENDED 21 MARCH 1998, 23 MARCH 2002 AND 17 MARCH 2007. as amended on 09 Mar 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRACTICE, APPRECIATION AND USE OF ALL FORMS OF CALLIGRAPHY AND LETTERING ARTS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.