Dogfen lywodraethu THE MID-NORFOLK RAILWAY PRESERVATION TRUST

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 23 MARCH 1995 AS AMENDED 6 MAY 2003 AND AMENDED 12 JUNE 2004 as amended on 23 Mar 1995 as amended on 26 Jul 2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PRESERVE AND TO RENOVATE RECONSTRUCT AND OPERATE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE, WHATEVER OF THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE THAT MAY EXIST OF THE PERMANENT WAY, TRACK, BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY BUILDING AS DEFINED IN SECTION 336(1) OF THE TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING ACT 1990), BRIDGES, OPERATING EQUIPMENT AND ROLLING STOCK ONCE FORMING PART OF OR CONNECTED WITH OR ADJACENT TO THE GREAT EASTERN RAILWAY LINE RUNNING BETWEEN COUNTY SCHOOL AT NORTH ELMHAM IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK AND WYMONDHAM IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK
Maes buddion
NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.