Dogfen lywodraethu Landmarks Specialist College

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/03/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/06/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/03/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 SEP 2016 as amended on 10 May 2021 as amended on 02 Apr 2024 as amended on 02 Apr 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To advance education, training and care to all persons and in particular to those with learning, physical and other disabilities, in a caring and sheltered environment including: a. Enhancing and improving those persons’ levels and ranges of life skills b. Promoting those persons’ self-esteem, confidence and sense of well-being c Enabling those persons’ access to the labour market place
Maes buddion
DERBYSHIRE NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.