Dogfen lywodraethu RAYNET-UK

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/12/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/10/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/10/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/11/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/10/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04 MAR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROTECT HUMAN LIFE AND PROPERTY BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF THE POLICE, THE AMBULANCE SERVICES,THE BRITISH RED CROSS,ST JOHN AMBULANCE BRIGADE,AND ANY OTHER ORGANISATION INVOLVED IN RESCUE SERVICES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.