Dogfen lywodraethu ISLE OF WIGHT UNIVERSITY FOR FREE TIME

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 FEB 1994 AS AMENDED ON 18 FEB 2005 AS AMENDED ON 27 APR 2007 AS AMENDED ON 17 APR 2009 as amended on 11 Sep 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF MIDDLE AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE NOT IN FULL-TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN THE ISLE OF WIGHT. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.