Dogfen lywodraethu MANCHESTER CITY GALLERIES TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 MAY 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 29 SEPTEMBER 2000, 11 JULY 2003 AND 23 FEBRUARY 2007 as amended on 01 Sep 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE CITIZENS AND OTHER RESIDENTS OF THE CITY OF MANCHESTER IN PARTICULAR AND OF OTHER CITIZENS AND RESIDENTS OF THE UNTIES KINGDOM IN GENERAL IN BRITISH AND FOREIGN HISTORY OF ARTS AND FOR THE BENEFITS OF SCHOLARS IN THE UNIVERSITIES AND OF LOCAL, NATIONAL AND FOREIGN RESEARCHERS IN HISTORY OF ARTS.
Maes buddion
CITY OF MANCHESTER AND UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.