Dogfen lywodraethu FOWNHOPE RECREATION FIELD ASSOCIATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/12/1993 AS AMENDED ON 30/05/1995 AS AMENDED ON 19/03/2003 AS AMENDED ON 11/09/2013 AS AMENDED ON 23/04/2014 as amended on 20 Mar 2019 as amended on 01 May 2018 as amended on 01 May 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF FOWNHOPE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE PURPOSE OF RELAXATION AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Maes buddion
IN PRACTICE, FOWNHOPE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.