Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRISTOL COMMONWEALTH SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/07/1995 AS AMENDED ON 10/01/1996 AS AMENDED ON 04/03/2008 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/2012 AS AMENDED ON 18/04/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) THE CHARITIES OBJECTS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE OBJECTS) ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS THE INCREASE AND SPREAD OF KNOWLEDGE RESPECTING THE PEOPLES AND COUNTRIES OF THE COMMONWEALTH (2) WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING SUB-CLAUSE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS (BUT NOT OTHERWISE) THE CHARITY MAY: (I) PROVIDE A MEETING PLACE IN BRISTOL FOR ITS MEMBERS (II) MAINTAIN A LIBRARY (III) HOLD MEETINGS AT SUCH INTERVALS AS THEY SHALL DETERMINE FOR THE DISCUSSION OF SUBJECTS OF COMMONWEALTH AND OTHER INTEREST (IV) ENCOURAGE THE STUDY OF THE GEOGRAPHY ETHNOLOGY HISTORY LITERATURE ART NATURAL RESOURCES ECONOMICS AND OTHER SUBJECTS OF COMMONWEALTH COUNTRIES IN ANY MANNER THAT THE CHARITY SHALL DETERMINE (V) PROMOTE THE COMPARATIVE STUDY OF THE WAYS OF LIFE IN COMMONWEALTH COUNTRIES AND ENCOURAGE INTERCHANGE OF IDEAS (VI) ENCOURAGE MUTUAL INTEREST IN COMMONWEALTH COUNTRIES AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE (VII) CO-OPERATE WITH OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS (VIII) USE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE METHOD PROPER TO THE CARRYING OUT OF THE OBJECTS
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.