Dogfen lywodraethu THE ART LIBRARIES SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IRELAND
Rhif yr elusen: 1048642

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 APRIL 1995, AS AMENDED 17 APRIL 1997, 8 FEBRUARY 2002, 8 JULY 2005 as amended on 30 Apr 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROMOTION OF ALL ASPECTS OF THE LIBRARIANSHIP OF THE VISUAL ARTS AND INCLUDING ARCHITECTURE AND DESIGN
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.