Dogfen lywodraethu London Youth Games Foundation
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/07/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/06/2010 as amended on 28 Jul 2014 as amended on 21 Feb 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 21 YEARS RESIDENT FOR THE MAIN PART, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE AREA OF GREATER LONDON, AS DEFINED BY THE LONDON GOVERNMENT ACT 1963 OR SUBSEQUENT AMENDMENT THEREOF, BY PROVIDING SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WITH ACTIVITIES, EVENTS AND FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Maes buddion
GREATER LONDON
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.