A.I.D.S. TRUST CYMRU
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
A service provider to those people both infected and affected by HIV and AIDS. 1. A day centre 2. Provides a range of complimentary therapies 3. Provides counselling 4. Provides information and advocacy 5. Provides 1-1 social and housing care 6. Provides educational sessions on raising awareness of sexually transmitted diseases in Comprehensive Schools in Wales, Youth Centres. 7. Pro
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2013
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Llety/tai
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Castell-nedd Port Talbot
- Ceredigion
- Dinas Abertawe
- Pen-y-bont Ar Ogwr
- Sir Benfro
- Sir Gaerfyrddin
Llywodraethu
- 23 Awst 1995: Cofrestrwyd
- 25 Tachwedd 2016: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- AIDS TRUST CYMRU (Enw gwaith)
- THE SWISH CENTRE (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £271.24k | £224.04k | £235.04k | £238.45k | £225.99k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £254.34k | £255.07k | £246.03k | £236.33k | £233.23k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 19 Awst 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 19 Awst 2013 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 JULY 1995 AS AMENDED 24 MARCH 1999 AND 10 MARCH 2000.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN SOUTH AND WEST WALES WHO ARE INFECTED OR AFFECTED BY HIV AND/OR AIDS AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING A) TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING AND ADVICE SERVICES FOR PERSONS LIVING WITH HIV INFECTION AND THEIR PARTNERS, FAMILIES AND CARERS B) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL NEED AMONGST SUCH PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION ASSISTANCE, GOODS AND SERVICES WHERE POSSIBLE C) TO ALLEVIATE LONELINESS AND ISOLATION OF SUCH PEOPLE D) TO PROMOTE THE SEXUAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF BOTH THOSE WHO ARE HIV POSITIVE AND THOSE WHO MAY BE AT RISK OF BECOMING SO.
Maes buddion
SOUTH AND WEST WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window