ASIAN MOTHER AND CHILD GROUP
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Group is designed for lonely, isolate and refugee women. Organising talks, cultural activities, classes and demonstrations run various workshops Monday afternoon school term time mother and toddler group for under 5 between 1:pm to 3:pm with the help of 3 cr+¿che workers, up stair we have on going activity lunch club once a month and etc...
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2012
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Croydon
- Surrey
Llywodraethu
- 28 Medi 1995: Cofrestrwyd
- 10 Ionawr 2014: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £6.71k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £6.12k | £5.20k | £4.80k | £5.00k | £800 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2013 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2013 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2012 | 01 Ionawr 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2012 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2011 | 11 Rhagfyr 2011 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2011 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2010 | 19 Ionawr 2011 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2010 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND JUNE 1995
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOLO AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THER NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH THE GROUP AND BY: (A)OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES TOGETHER WITH THE OPPORTUNITY FOR PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH A GROUP; (B)ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE AREA. 2.TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF MOTHERS AND WOMEN IN THE AREA.
Maes buddion
LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window