Dogfen lywodraethu INDEPENDENT ADVOCACY (NORTH TYNESIDE)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/09/1995 AS AMENDED ON 01/10/1997 AS AMENDED ON 12/07/2000 AS AMENDED ON 06/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 19/10/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM TO PERSONS IN OR OF THE BUROUGH OF NORTH TYNESIDE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY THE PROVISION OF ADVOCACY SERVICES, ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT IN ORDER TO GAIN ACCESS TO EDUCATIONAL, ECONOMIC, HEALTH, HOUSING, LEISURE, SOCIAL WELFARE AND OTHER SERVICES.
Maes buddion
BOROUGH OF NORTH TYNESIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.