Dogfen lywodraethu AUDIENCES CENTRAL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 APRIL 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS ON 31 AUGUST 1995, 26 JULY 2000, 18 MAY 2004 AND 9 JULY 2004 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION 25 JUNE 2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN BIRMINGHAM TO INCLUDE STAFFORDSHIRE, HEREFORDSHIRE, WORCESTERSHIRE, WARWICKSHIRE AND THE WEST MIDLANDS COUNTY ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY PROVIDING CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITH: 2.1 ADVICE, TRAINING AND INFORMATION; AND 2.2 OTHER ASSISTANCE APPROPRIATE TO THEIR NEEDS SO AS TO ENABLE SUCH ORGANISATIONS TO CARRY OUT THEIR CHARITABLE WORK MORE EFFECTIVELY AND EFFICIENTLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
BIRMINGHAM, STAFFORDSHIRE, HEREFORDSHIRE, WORCESTERSHIRE, WARWICKSHIRE, WEST MIDLANDS COUNTY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.