Dogfen lywodraethu KENT OPERA
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 SEP 1994 AS AMENDED ON 31 OCT 1995 AS AMENDED ON 17 JUN 2004 AS AMENDED ON 26 APR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 01 AUG 2016 as amended on 24 May 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) To advance the education and the development of young professional performers in opera, drama and the creative arts through working alongside and sharing their practice with the disadvantaged and *socially excluded in workshops, live performances and online. (2) To promote social inclusion for the public benefit through the provision of our projects of music and/or drama designed to help develop skills and self-confidence, with the aim of assisting integration into society and in particular into education, training and employment. (3) To promote, where feasible, the rehabilitation of prisoners for the public benefit in particular, but not exclusively, by delivering our music and/or drama projects inside and outside prisons as a means to build the skills and capacity of offenders so that they can break the cycle of reoffending. * ‘Socially excluded’ means being excluded from society, or parts of society, as a result of one of more of the following factors: Unemployment; financial hardship; youth or old age; ill health (physical or mental); substance abuse or dependency including alcohol and drugs; poor educational or skills attainment; relationship and family breakdown; poor housing; crime (either as a victim of crime or as an offender rehabilitating into society).
Maes buddion
PRIMARILY IN THE MEDWAY TOWNS, KENT AREA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.