Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRIDGE (EAST MIDLANDS)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/10/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/02/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/03/2012 as amended on 23 May 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION OF HOMELESS PERSONS IN NEED IN THE EAST MIDLANDS AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES CALCULATED TO ALLEVIATE THEIR NEED. TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF HOMELESS PERSONS AND THOSE AT RISK OF HOMELESSNESS IN THE EAST MIDLANDS.
Maes buddion
EAST MIDLANDS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.