Dogfen lywodraethu THE PLEASANCE THEATRE TRUST
Rhif yr elusen: 1050944

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/06/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/06/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 MAR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE DRAMATIC ARTS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.