HASTINGS AND ROTHER BOND BOARD
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The charity provides assistance to individuals who are homeless or in serious housing need in the Hastings and Rother areas of East Sussex by way of the provision of bonds or cash deposits in order to secure private rented accommodation. It also offers tenancy support, a video inventory service, and, until April 2007, a Bond Bank to hold deposits safely, independently and impartially.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2007
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Llety/tai
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Dwyrain Sussex
Llywodraethu
- 24 Tachwedd 1995: Cofrestrwyd
- 31 Rhagfyr 2009: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- HASTINGS AND ROTHER RENT DEPOSIT SCHEME (Enw gwaith)
- HASTINGS RENT DEPOSIT SCHEME (Enw gwaith)
- THE BOND BANK (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £64.75k | £42.61k | £57.01k | £62.95k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £52.02k | £50.18k | £59.32k | £64.28k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2009 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2009 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2008 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2008 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2007 | 28 Ionawr 2008 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2007 | 30 Ionawr 2008 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2006 | 15 Rhagfyr 2006 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2006 | 15 Rhagfyr 2006 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2005 | 14 Rhagfyr 2005 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2005 | 14 Rhagfyr 2005 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20TH NOVEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 MARCH 2003.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF PEOPLE LIVING IN HASTINGS AND ROTHER (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ISSUING BONDS TO LANDLORDS IN LIEU OF CASH DEPOSITS FROM PROSPECTIVE TENANTS TO ENABLE THEM TO OBTAIN ACCOMMODATION THAT THEY WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO SECURE. (2) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH AND ADVANCE EDUCATION INTO THE BARRIERS THAT PREVENT PROVISION OF OR ACCESS TO PRIVATE RENTED ACCOMMODATION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED-- IN PRACTICE HASTINGS BOROUGH AND ROTHER DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window