Dogfen lywodraethu THE STANMORE & DISTRICT U3A

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/02/1995 AS AMENDED ON 19/02/1996 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17/02/1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09/03/1998 AS AMENDED ON 24/11/2015 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Maes buddion
NORTH WEST LONDON AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.