Dogfen lywodraethu CHILD CONCERN
Rhif yr elusen: 1052381

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MARCH 1990 AS AMENDED 14 JUNE 1995, 23 APRIL 1998, 25 APRIL 2001 AND 23 APRIL 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO WORK TO FURTHER AND IMPROVE THE KNOWLEDGE AND PRACTICE OF ALL PERSONS INVOLVED AND INTERESTED IN THE LAW AND PRACTICE RELATING TO CHILDREN AND CHILDREN'S ISSUES.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.