Dogfen lywodraethu WEAR VALLEY CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/08/1993 AS AMENDED ON 21/02/2004 AS AMENDED ON 26/02/2014 as amended on 15 Mar 2021 as amended on 15 Nov 2021 as amended on 17 Jul 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
I)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST THE LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD BY THE CHURCH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF PURPOSE, VISION, VALUES AND BELIEFS. II) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL FURTHER THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECT OF THE CHURCH OR ANY OF THEM. III) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH CONSISTENTLY WITH THE STATEMENT.
Maes buddion
IN PRACTICE WEAR VALLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.