Dogfen lywodraethu THE NOON MEMORIAL LEGACY TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH DECEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY DEEDS OF AMENDMENT DATED 22ND FEBRUARY 1996 AND 23RD SEPTEMBER 1999 AND 11TH FEBRUARY 2005 AS AMENDED ON 16 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 04 OCT 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE OBJECTS) SHALL BE SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) MAY INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS INSOFAR AS THE SAME MAY BE CHARITABLE NAMELY: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY (C) THE ALLEVIATION OF RACIAL DISCRIMINATION AND (D) THE TREATMENT OF THE SICK AND INFIRM.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.