Dogfen lywodraethu WE ARE BEAMS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 MAR 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 SEP 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 DEC 2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 JUL 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE WE ARE BEAMS IS ESTABLISHED TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE TO CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES, AND WHERE THEY ARE IN NEED TO FAMILIES AND CARERS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 0-25 WITH DISABILITIES, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING ADVICE, INFORMATION, SUPPORT AND EDUCATION FACILITIES AND SHORT BREAKS. PARENTS OF CHILDREN WITHOUT A CONFIRMED DIAGNOSIS OF DISABILITY OR IMPAIRMENT MAY ALSO BE OFFERED ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.