THE RIFLES AND THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE REGIMENTAL TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Promoting the Army, the Regiment (The Rifles), the RGBW and its antecedent regiments often through grants. It also: seeks to advance the education of the public, wider regiment and cadets in matters of deeds, history and training; supports heritage and core county activities; commemorates and remembers the fallen; addresses distress; and, fosters regimental ethos.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2022
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Hamdden
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Bracknell Forest
- De Swydd Gaerloyw
- Dinas Bryste
- Gorllewin Berkshire
- Reading
- Slough
- Swydd Gaerloyw
- Wiltshire
- Wokingham
- Ynys Wyth
Llywodraethu
- 30 Mehefin 2017: y derbyniwyd cronfeydd gan 255781 ROCKE BEQUEST
- 24 Gorffennaf 2017: y derbyniwyd cronfeydd gan 1054654 THE RIFLES AND THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIR...
- 24 Gorffennaf 2017: y derbyniwyd cronfeydd gan 1054659 THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE...
- 22 Medi 2022: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1119061 THE RIFLES REGIMENTAL TRUST
- 17 Ebrill 1996: Cofrestrwyd
- 22 Medi 2022: Tynnwyd (TROSGLWYDDO CRONFEYDD)
- THE RIFLES AND THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE REGIMENT OFFICERS' TRUST (Enw blaenorol)
- THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE REGIMENT OFFICERS' TRUST (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £282.36k | £20.86k | £17.97k | £13.60k | £33 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £62.08k | £44.06k | £46.62k | £321.10k | £39.32k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 21 Medi 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 28 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 04 Chwefror 2021 | 4 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | 28 Ionawr 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 30 JUN 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE (1) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN AND IN PARTICULAR THE REGIMENT. (2) TO COMMEMORATE AND REMEMBER THOSE MEMBERS, OR FORMER MEMBERS, OF THE REGIMENT AND THE FORMER REGIMENTS WHO HAVE LOST THEIR LIVES OR SUFFERED INJURY, OR PUT THEMSELVES AT RISK OF LOSS OF LIFE OR INJURY, IN SERVICE TO THE PUBLIC. (3) TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS WHO ARE SERVING OR WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE REGIMENT OR THE FORMER REGIMENTS, OR THE DEPENDENTS OR FAMILIES OF SUCH PERSONS, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (4) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT AND THE FORMER REGIMENTS IN THE HISTORY, DEEDS, TRADITIONS AND ROLE OF THE REGIMENT AND THE FORMER REGIMENTS. (5) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PERSONS SERVING IN AFFILIATED CADET UNITS IN THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND SERVICE TO THE COMMUNITY, AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH AFFILIATED CADET UNITS.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window