THE SOAP AND DETERGENT INDUSTRY ENVIRONMENTAL TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The SADIE Trust Activities are to provide funds for and general support for the benefit of the public in the United Kingdom or elsewhere including other charities and educational establishments to promote research and education into the effects of pollution.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 September 2008
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 18 Ebrill 1996: Cofrestrwyd
- 12 Tachwedd 2009: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- THE SADIE TRUST (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £12 | £69 | £69 | £69 | £69 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2008 | 25 Mehefin 2009 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2008 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2007 | 17 Mehefin 2008 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2007 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2006 | 24 Awst 2007 | 25 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2006 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2005 | 21 Mehefin 2006 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2005 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2004 | 02 Awst 2005 | 3 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2004 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH NOVEMBER 1995
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE PROVISION OF FUNDS AND GENERAL SUPPORT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE, OF PROJECTS TO RESTORE OR REBUILD SEA WALLS, SEASHORES, RIVERBANKS AND ANY OTHER INLAND WATERWAYS, BODIES OF WATER OR COASTAL AREAS INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION PROJECTS FOR THE RESTORATION OF AREAS OF OUTSTANDING NATURAL BEAUTY OR SPECIAL SCIENTIFIC INTEREST VULNERABLE TO THE EFFECTS OF POLLUTION (B) THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE OF RESEARCH AND EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OR FIELDS OF RESTORATION OR REBUILDING OF SEAWALLS, SEASHORES, RIVERBANKS AND ANY OTHER INLAND WATERWAYS, BODIES OF WATER OR COASTAL AREAS INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION PROJECTS FOR THE RESTORATION OF AREAS OF OUTSTANDING NATURAL BEAUTY OR SPECIAL SCIENTIFIC INTEREST VULNERABLE TO THE EFFECTS OF POLLUTION. (C) THE PROVISION OF FUNDS FOR AND GENERAL SUPPORT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE OF OTHER CHARITIES AND EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS INVOLVED IN THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH AND EDUCATION TO THE EXTENT THAT THESE ARE APPLIED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES. (D) THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW TO BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window